Case: 05-87-00500-CV
05-87-00500-CV
05/06/1987
Mandamus
Valley Industries, Inc.
Hon. Harlan Martin, Judge, 192nd District Court
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/18/2001 | Order entered | Destroy | |
01/18/2001 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
10/05/2000 | Record Pickup | | |
06/09/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
08/05/1987 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/05/1987 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/05/1987 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/08/1987 | Submitted | | |
05/08/1987 | Submission | | |
05/08/1987 | Submitted | | |
05/07/1987 | Letter Filed | | |
05/07/1987 | Memorandum of Authorities | | |
05/07/1987 | Response to Motion | | |
05/07/1987 | Response to Motion | | |
05/07/1987 | Supplemental Record Filed | | |
05/06/1987 | MattConv | | |
05/06/1987 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
05/06/1987 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/06/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Harlan A Martin
85-6687-K