judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00054-CR
09-82-00054-CR
04/20/1982
Other Felony
Rochon, Gerald Michael
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1982Mandate Issued
08/25/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/08/1982Brief Filed
05/17/1982Brief Filed
04/20/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
38983 R
Life