judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00195-CV
04-82-00195-CV
04/21/1982
Contract
Irving Athletic Club, Inc.
Rick Brenner Co.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/12/1982Mandate Issued
08/12/1982Mandate Issued
06/23/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/23/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/03/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/21/1982No Description Available.
04/21/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/14/1982Appeal Bond Filed
03/25/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/12/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
81-CI-17843