Case: 03-19-00305-CR
03-19-00305-CR
05/06/2019
Aggravated Robbery
Elijah Zuriel Lopez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/23/2019 | Brief was not filed | State |
| ||||
12/09/2019 | Anders brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/20/2020 | Mandate issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
01/30/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
01/30/2020 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
01/29/2020 | Submitted | | |||||||
01/08/2020 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
01/07/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
12/23/2019 | Brief was not filed |
| |||||||
12/09/2019 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||||
12/09/2019 | Anders brief filed |
| |||||||
10/30/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
10/30/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
10/08/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
10/08/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
09/09/2019 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
09/09/2019 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
08/19/2019 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||||
08/09/2019 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
08/08/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
05/08/2019 | Letter received |
| |||||||
05/06/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/20/2020 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
04/20/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lopez, Elijah Zuriel | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Michael C. Shulman Mr. Elijah Zuriel Lopez |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Stacey M. Soule Ms. Jamie Liu |
Trial Court Information
453rd District Court
Hays
Honorable David Junkin
CR-18-1221
Carolyn Burklund
25 years