judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00496-CV
05-82-00496-CV
04/21/1982
Contract
William Pearson and Central Trailer Sales, Inc.
S & L Homes Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/2018Order enteredDestroy
07/13/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/13/2018Letter issued by the court
10/25/1983Mandate Issued
10/21/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/23/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
05/24/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/12/1983Response to Motion
05/05/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/25/1983Copy of Judgment Mailed
04/22/1983Letter Filed
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/05/1983Letter Filed
03/29/1983Submitted
03/29/1983Brief Filed
02/14/1983Submission
07/16/1982Brief Filed
06/25/1982Brief Filed
05/20/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/21/1982Transcript Filed
04/15/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
04/15/1982Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Craig T. Enoch
81-5078-E