judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00073-CV
02-82-00073-CV
04/21/1982
Divorce
Vautrain, Betty Jean
Vautrain, Lynn D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1983Writ DisposedDismissed
03/21/1983Writ Filed
02/24/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/22/1983Response Filed
02/11/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
231st District Court
Tarrant
231-9733