Case: WR-88,493-02
WR-88,493-02
05/06/2019
11.07 HC
UVUKANSI, FEANYICHI EZEKWESI
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/14/2021 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. |
| ||||
12/30/2020 | SUPP RECD | | |||||
09/23/2020 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
12/05/2019 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
12/05/2019 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
11/07/2019 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD |
| |||||
07/08/2019 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD |
| |||||
05/24/2019 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
05/08/2019 | RR RECEIVED |
| |||||
05/06/2019 | WRIT RECEIVED |
| |||||
01/25/2019 | EXTENSION RQST 73.5 DISP | Granted |
| ||||
01/08/2019 | EXTENSION RQST 73.5 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/14/2021 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
UVUKANSI, FEANYICHI EZEKWESI | Applicant | Randy Schaffer |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-14-00527-CR
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
1353181-A