judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00094-CV
08-82-00094-CV
04/19/1982
Contract
Lawrence, Curby Gerald
Lawrence, Barbara Boone
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
11/10/1983Mandate Issued
08/24/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/19/1982Submitted
11/19/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
10/06/1982Submission
06/11/1982Brief Filed
05/19/1982Brief Filed
04/19/1982Statement of Facts Filed
04/19/1982Transcript Filed
03/12/1982Bond Filed - Amended, HC, etc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
120th District Court
El Paso
81-7230