judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00234-CV
14-82-00234-CV
04/20/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Frank B. Hall & Co., Inc., Et Al
Buck, Larry W.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/12/1985Mandate Issued
06/10/1985Higher Court DecisionDENIED
02/28/1985No description available.GRANTED
02/12/1985Mandate Issued
02/06/1985No description available.
01/28/1985Case stored
12/12/1984Higher Court DecisionDISMISSED
10/15/1984Writ of Error FILED
09/13/1984Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
09/13/1984Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
08/22/1984Opposition filed
08/10/1984Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
08/09/1984Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
07/26/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/19/1984No description available.
05/10/1984Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/04/1984Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
02/16/1984Mtn.Increase Supersedeas Bond DISPOSED-APEGRANTED
02/10/1984Motion to increase Supersedeas Bond FILED
02/08/1984Motion to increase Supersedeas Bond FILED
07/15/1983Response to Reply Brief FILED
06/28/1983Response to Reply Brief FILED
05/19/1983Mtn.Increase Supersedeas Bond DISPOSED-APEGRANTED
05/19/1983Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/16/1983Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
05/12/1983Submission
05/03/1983Motion to increase Supersedeas Bond FILED
12/27/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
12/09/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/01/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/14/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/28/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/20/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/02/1982Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA
08/19/1982No description available.
08/06/1982Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/05/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/26/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/23/1982Opposition filed
07/20/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/12/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/08/1982No description available.GRANTED
06/24/1982No description available.
05/13/1982Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/13/1982No description available.GRANTED
05/13/1982No description available.
05/06/1982Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
04/26/1982Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
04/26/1982No description available.
04/20/1982Transcript FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable LYNN N. HUGHES
78-12758