judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7693
A-7693
01/25/1960
Application for Writ of Error
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, GULF OIL CORPORATION, HAHN AND CLAY, TEXAS TUNNELING COMPANY, BRIGGS-WEAVER MACHINERY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/28/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/25/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/23/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/20/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/17/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
01/27/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
01/25/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/1960Order from Lower Court filed
03/29/1960Response to Motion filed
03/28/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/25/1960Response to Petition
02/23/1960Response to Petition
02/20/1960Response to Petition
02/17/1960Response to Petition
01/27/1960Response to Petition
01/25/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/25/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Tunneling CompanyRespondent
Hahn and ClayRespondent
Fidelity and Deposit Company of MarylandRespondent
United States of AmericaPetitioner
Gulf Oil Corporation Respondent
Briggs-Weaver Machinery CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information