judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7678
A-7678
01/13/1960
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS I.S.D. AND W. T. WHITE
AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, LOCAL UNION NO. 1442, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/27/1960Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
05/24/1960Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/27/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/28/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/21/1960Letter Filed
05/27/1960Brief in Support of Petition
05/24/1960Supplemental Brief filed
04/27/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/28/1960Response to Petition
01/13/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/13/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Local Union No. 1442, et al.Respondent
Dallas I.S.D. and W. T. WhitePetitioner
H. P. KuceraAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information