judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAZILE (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38160
Short Caption:BAZILE (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0388Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11878
08/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant's notice of appeal is premature. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-13300
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13451
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/17/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2001. 01-13451