judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN JAMES LARREW V. KEITH SELF, ET AL

Case Information: 10-SP-1053
Short Caption:STEPHEN JAMES LARREW V. KEITH SELF, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Denial - Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC796-09Filed Date:07/12/2010

Opening Event Date:07/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/23/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/15/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStephen James Larrew YPro SeN
AppelleeSelf, KeithNPro SeN
AppelleeJim Foster NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/12/2010FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/12/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (RECEIVED ONLY)
08/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (served by DCCA)
09/10/2010ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. A. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: ETW)
09/16/2010RECORD COPIES
09/16/2010RECORD INDEX
09/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/09/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF/limited appendix (dfe)
01/04/2011ORDERED: That the Clerk shall file the response as the appellant's brief and limited appendix. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs of appellees shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/limited appendix (dfe)
02/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 4, 2011, directing appellees to file their briefs within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the briefs have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellees shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit their briefs, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file their briefs, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (Castillo)
03/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 9, 2011, directing appellees to submit their briefs w/in 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the briefs have not yet been filed, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of thiscourt on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW)
03/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening -Summary
05/16/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED - from aplt (Stephen James Larrew) to the following: c/o Buster Cole Unit, 3801 Silo Road, Bonham, TX 75418
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/23/2011FiledSubmitted To Ruiz,Oberly,King
09/27/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and King, Senior Judge.)
12/15/2011LodgedLetter regarding questions and objections to MOJ. (Appellant)
12/20/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider (Served by DCCA on 12/20/11). (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se motion for reconsideration
03/15/2012FiledMandate