judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-289
A-289
07/31/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ST. LOUIS, BROWNSVILLE AND MEXICO RAILWAY COMPANY, DEBTOR, GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE AND ST. LOUIS, BROWNSVILLE AND MEXICO RAILWAY COMPANY, DEBTOR
TEXAS MEXICAN RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/22/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/15/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/15/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/08/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/1945Order from Lower Court filed
09/08/1945Motion to Correct filed Filing granted
12/01/1944Letter Filed
11/22/1944Reply to Response
11/17/1944Response to Motion filed
11/15/1944Brief in Support of Petition
11/15/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/08/1944Response to Petition
07/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guy A. Thompson, Trustee and St. Louis, Brownsville and Mexico Railway Company, debtorPetitioner
St. Louis, Brownsville and Mexico Railway Company, debtorPetitioner
Texas Mexican Railway CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information