judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7691
A-7691
01/22/1960
Application for Writ of Error
SYLVAN T. BAER
DALLAS THEATER CENTER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/03/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/28/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/15/1960Reply to Response
03/08/1960Response to Motion filed
03/03/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/28/1960Response to Petition
01/22/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sylvan T. BaerPetitioner
Dallas Theater CenterRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information