judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7719
A-7719
02/11/1960
Application for Writ of Error
UNITED AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
WILLIAM HENRY SELBY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/03/1960Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/28/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/13/1960Amended PetitionPetitioner
02/15/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/08/1960Response to Motion filed
08/03/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/20/1960Dissenting opinion issued.
07/20/1960Opinion issued
05/11/1960Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1960Response to Motion filed
04/28/1960Motion for RehearingFiling granted
04/13/1960Amended Petition
04/08/1960Response to Motion filed
03/31/1960Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
02/15/1960Response to Petition
02/11/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/11/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
United American Insurance CompanyPetitioner
William Henry SelbyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information