judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7711
A-7711
02/08/1960
Application for Writ of Error
AMARILLO ABSTRACT AND TITLE COMPANY
UNAUTHORIZED PRACTICE OF LAW COMMITTEE OF THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/23/1960Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/23/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/02/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/08/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1960Response to Motion filed
06/23/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/23/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/02/1960Response to Petition
02/22/1960Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
02/08/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/08/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/08/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unauthorized Practice of Law Committee of the State Bar of TexasRespondent
Amarillo Abstract and Title CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information