judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7714
A-7714
02/09/1960
Application for Writ of Error
STELLA R. LOPEZ, ET VIR
ASSOCIATED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/31/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/24/1960Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/22/1960Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/20/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/09/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1960Response to Motion filed
03/31/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/24/1960Response to Brief filed
02/22/1960Brief on the Merits
02/20/1960Response to Petition
02/09/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/09/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stella R. Lopez, et virPetitioner
Associated Employers Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information