judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7721
A-7721
02/11/1960
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN KIRSCHKE, ET AL.
CITY OF HOUSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/28/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/09/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/25/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/01/1961Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
04/28/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/09/1960Reply to Response
02/25/1960Response to Petition
02/11/1960Document received (See Remarks)
02/11/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John Kirschke, et al.Petitioner
City of HoustonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information