judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7720
A-7720
02/11/1960
Application for Writ of Error
NATHAN MINCHER, NATAHN (NAT) MINCHEN, ET AL.
SOHIO PETROLEUM COMPANY, FLORA BARNES, R. L. FIELDS AND B. E. FIELDS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/26/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/26/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/26/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/06/1960Post submission brief filedRespondent
03/01/1960Errata FiledRespondent
02/27/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/25/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/12/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
04/12/1961Opinion issued
02/03/1961Response to Motion filed
01/31/1961Response to Motion filed
01/26/1961Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/26/1961Motion for Rehearing
01/26/1961Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/11/1961Opinion issued
06/06/1960Post submission brief filed
04/27/1960Document received (See Remarks)
03/01/1960Errata Filed
02/27/1960Response to Petition
02/25/1960Response to Petition
02/11/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/11/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Flora BarnesRespondent
Natahn (Nat) Minchen, et al.Petitioner
R. L. Fields and B. E. FieldsRespondent
Nathan MincherPetitioner
Sohio Petroleum CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information