Case: 01-13-01000-CV
01-13-01000-CV
11/20/2013
Contract
Contractors Source, Inc.
Amegy Bank National Association d/b/a Amegy Bank of Texas
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/30/2014 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
04/16/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
02/14/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/17/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
04/16/2015 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
02/20/2015 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
02/20/2015 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
02/05/2015 | Opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||||
02/05/2015 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
10/14/2014 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/04/2014 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
04/30/2014 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
04/16/2014 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
04/16/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
04/16/2014 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
03/16/2014 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
03/05/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/04/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
02/14/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
02/14/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
01/21/2014 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
01/15/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
01/13/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/10/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
01/10/2014 | Court fee due | | |||||||
01/07/2014 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||||
12/23/2013 | Record due | | |||||||
12/16/2013 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
12/12/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
12/11/2013 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
12/10/2013 | Court fee due | | |||||||
12/10/2013 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
11/25/2013 | Document filed |
| |||||||
11/21/2013 | Notification received that no record was taken |
| |||||||
11/21/2013 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
11/20/2013 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||||
11/20/2013 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
11/18/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/22/2013 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/17/2021 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Amegy Bank National Association d/b/a Amegy Bank of Texas | Appellee | Alexis Foster Laura Gibson |
Contractors Source, Inc. | Appellant | Thomas L. Hunt |
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 157th District Court
2012-53936
Court Reporter 157th District Court