judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7726
A-7726
02/15/1960
Application for Writ of Error
RED BALL MOTOR FREIGHT, INC.
FIRST NATIONAL BANK IN DALLAS AND REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS, MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK AT DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/11/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/08/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/01/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/29/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/11/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/08/1960Reply to Response
03/01/1960Response to Petition
02/29/1960Response to Petition
02/15/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/15/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Red Ball Motor Freight, Inc.Petitioner
Mercantile National Bank at DallasRespondent
First National Bank in Dallas and Republic National Bank of DallasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information