judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7727
A-7727
02/15/1960
Application for Writ of Error
ROY POWELL
OLD TEXAS MINING AND OIL COMPANY AND BLANTON W. R. FORD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/07/1960Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/31/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/07/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/27/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1960Brief in Support of Petition
03/31/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/07/1960Reply to Response
02/27/1960Response to Petition
02/15/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/15/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Old Texas Mining and Oil Company and Blanton W. R. FordRespondent
Roy PowellPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information