judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRASS (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42121
Short Caption:BRASS (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130159BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16435
11/07/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04-RR/ML/WM 03-18713
12/02/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-19313
12/02/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2003. 03-19313