judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PUGH VS. BENDER

Case Information: 42120
Short Caption:PUGH VS. BENDERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42443
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A391476Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Douglas, GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/21/2003 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lovell & Lovell--check no. 2145.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16430
10/20/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/20/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17447
10/21/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/24/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-19579
12/04/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-20157
12/05/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/07/03-07/17/03, and 09/03/03. To Court Reporter: Kit McDonald, Maureen Schorn, Kendall Heath. 03-20288
12/22/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 8, 2003. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 03-21252
01/28/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/07/03; 07/17/03; 10/08/03; and 10/22/03 Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 04-01770
02/05/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/09/03; 07/10/03; 07/11/03; 07/14/03; and 07/15/03. Court Reporter: Kendall D. Heath. 04-02297
03/31/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The Pughs and the Benders shall each have thirty days from the date of this order within which to show cause why their respective appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and why they should not be sanctioned for their failure to properly complete the docketing statements. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that the appellants' responses are served. Nos. 42120/42443 cases are not consolidated. 04-05996
04/19/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
05/03/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Pughs' Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 42120/42443 - not consolidated. 04-08070
05/03/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Barry and Donna Bender's Reply to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 42120/42443 - not consolidated. 04-08071
05/05/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit Supplying Exhibit 1 to Barry and Donna Bender's Reply to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 42120/42443 - not consolidated. 04-08270
05/13/2004MotionFiled Reply to Response. Barry and Donna Bender's Reply to Pugh's Response to Order to Show Cause. No.s 42120/42443 - not consoliated. 04-08962
06/28/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Docket No. 42120 is an appeal from a judgment on a jury verdict and a district court order denying a new trial. Docket No. 42443 is an appeal from a district court order awarding attorney fees in a lesser amount than had been requested. We conclude that we lack jurisdiction over the Pughs' appeal and so " . . . we dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 42120." Having reviewed the parties responses, we conclude that sanctions are not warranted in these appeals. We caution counsel, however, to give proper attention to the docketing statement in the future. NNP04S-MS/NB/DA. Nos. 42120/42443 - cases are not consolidated. 04-11778
06/28/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Carl E. Lovell. Returned unfiled, the original "Appellant's Opening Brief and the Appendix to Opening Brief, Volumes 1 through 5, received on April 5, 2004."
07/23/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-11940
07/23/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2004. 04-11940