judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARMSEN VS. ROCKY MOUNTAIN CO.

Case Information: 42136
Short Caption:HARMSEN VS. ROCKY MOUNTAIN CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 491199LCClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/27/2003 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Earl Monsey--check no. 13789.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16652
10/27/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17886
10/27/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/29/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (docketing statement)
04/14/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 3, 2004. 04-06851
08/05/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 31, 2004. 04-14172
09/20/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-17388
09/28/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-17948
11/16/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). We again direct appellants to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the appropriate document. 04-21020
11/30/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-21800
01/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. 05-00646
02/14/2005MotionFiled Motion. Appellants' Motion for Order Extending Time within which to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 05-02935
02/17/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. for an extension of time to file an answer to this court's order to show cause filed February 14, 2005. Appellants shall have until March 14, 2005, to file and serve their answer. 05-03200
03/15/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-05116
03/16/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Supplement to Appellant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-05161
05/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. As this court has jurisdiction over this appeal, we shall allow this appeal to proceed. Appellants shall have 45 days from this order's date to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed under NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-09173
06/27/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 22, 2005. 05-12623
07/25/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-14764
07/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 25, 2005. Appellants shall have until August 8, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 05-15092
08/09/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-15742
08/09/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-15743
09/13/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-18039
09/13/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-18040
10/13/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-20257
04/19/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-08206
04/19/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06-MD/NB/RP
06/30/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-13630
07/26/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-14484
07/26/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2006. 06-14484