judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARDSON CONST. VS. DESERT VALLEY CONST.

Case Information: 42135
Short Caption:RICHARDSON CONST. VS. DESERT VALLEY CONST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A451708Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/21/2003 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/06/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16640
10/06/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/06/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/15/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Parker, Nelson & Arin, Chtd. - check no. 11419.
10/21/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Appellants shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. 03-19756
12/17/2003Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 03-20976
01/02/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Richardson Construction, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Submit Certified Copies of Case Appeal Statement and File Docketing Statement. 04-00065
01/08/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 2, 2004. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on December 17, 2003. The clerk shall also file the certified copy of the case appeal statement attached to appellants' motion. 04-00468
01/08/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-20976
01/08/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on December 22, 2003. 04-00469
01/09/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Eugene Osko. (Docketing Statement and Case Appeal Statement)
01/21/2004Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 04-01235
01/27/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 04-01642
01/27/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.