judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MACK (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE C/W 42073

Case Information: 42149
Short Caption:MACK (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE C/W 42073Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 42073 *, 42149Related Case(s): 40885 , 47282 , 65175 , 65307 , 67849 , 67849-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C182002Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/12/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16671
10/20/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Certified copy of order due: 30 days. 03-17404
10/28/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/20/03 addressed to Christopher Mack returned. No forwarding address.
11/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-18723
11/24/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-19601
12/15/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on October 10, 2003. 03-20842
12/24/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-21447
02/23/2004Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.
03/02/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-03921
03/02/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 04-03922
03/24/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-05502
03/24/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 04-05503
04/26/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-07602
04/30/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. to Reply Brief filed on 04/26/04. Attached to inside back cover of original and copies of reply brief. 04-07967
04/30/2004MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 42073/42149 (04-07968).
05/19/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On April 21, 2004, we directed appellant to file the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 42073 within 15 days. On April 30, 2004, appellant's counsel, Mr. Marvin L. Longabaugh, moved to consolidate these appeals. In support of the motion, Mr. Longabaugh notes that the appeals 'involve common questions of law and fact as they arose allegedly out of the same incident.' Mr. Longabaugh further requests that this court accept the opening brief filed on March 2, 2004, in Docket No. 42149 as the opening brief in Docket No. 42073. Cause appearing, we grant the motion and consolidate the above-entitled appeals all appellate purposes. The briefs filed in Docket No. 42149 will be accepted as the briefs for Docket No. 42073. We vacate that portion of our April 21, 2004, order entered in Docket No. 42073 directing appellant to file an opening brief and appendix. Nos. 42073/42149 (04-09262).
07/29/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Longabaugh Law Offices. Nos. 42073/42179 (04-13848).
11/08/2004Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Request for Leave to Submit Proper Person Pleadings (N.R.A.P. Rule 46(b)). Nos. 42073/42149. (04-20568)
12/07/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Briefing for these consolidated appeals was completed on April 26, 2004, with the filing of the reply brief. On November 8, 2004, appellant submitted a motion for leave to file proper person documents. fn1[Because we elect to resolve this document on its merits, we direct the clerk to file the proper person motion received on November 8, 2004.] We note that appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal. We further note that appellant's counsel has filed all required documents on behalf of appellant for this appeal. No good cause appearing, we deny appellant's motion to file documents in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). Appellant shall address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel of record. Nos. 42073/42149. (04-22281)
12/07/2004Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellant's request for Leave to Submit Proper Person Pleadings (N.R.A.P. Rule 46(b)). Nos. 42073/42149. (04-20568)
01/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). Nos. 42149/42073. (05-00662)
01/12/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP05-RR/MG/JH. Nos. 42149/42073.
02/14/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding. "We ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMANDED with instructions to vacate Mack's Kidnapping conviction." Nos. 42073/42149. 05-02889
03/11/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-03280
03/11/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/23/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2005. 05-03280