judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YOUNKIN (CLARENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42146
Short Caption:YOUNKIN (CLARENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38565
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175082Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/05/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16667
10/20/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 10/9/03 Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. Due Date: 10 days
10/27/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Dismissing Defendant's Motion to Appoint Counsel and State's Response to Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) filed in district court on October 9, 2003. 03-17916
10/27/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: October 15, 2003. 03-17917
11/13/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 42146/42191/42252 - cases are not consolidated. 03-18902
03/05/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 04-04255
03/05/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/02/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-10102
06/29/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-10362
06/29/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2004. 04-10362