judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SLAUGHTER VS. SOURCE CAPITAL LEASING

Case Information: 42145
Short Caption:SLAUGHTER VS. SOURCE CAPITAL LEASINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A414437Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/23/2003 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16666
10/07/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/07/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/15/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mont E. Tanner - check no. 2249.
10/15/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 8, 2003. 03-17135
10/23/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/07/2003Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 03-18671
11/18/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19207
11/20/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed November 18, 2003. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on November 7, 2003. 03-19327
11/20/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-18671
11/21/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Aubrey Goldberg. (docketing statement)
02/05/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-02338
02/13/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-02837
03/04/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/29/02, 05/30/02, and 05/31/02. To Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 04-04101
03/26/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. The required deposit has not been paid to Court Recorder Paula Walsh. 04-05722
05/20/2004MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Parties' NRAP Rule 42 Stipulation to Voluntary Dismiss Appeal. 04-09402
07/06/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. The parties have stipulation to the dismissal of this appeal. Case appearing, we approve the stipulation and " . . . dismiss this appeal. NRAP 42(b). Court recorder Paula Walsh has notified this court that despite the certification on appellant's transcript request form that counsel paid the required deposit for the requested transcripts, the deposit has not been paid. In light of the parties' stipulation, we conclude that the production of transcripts is no longer necessary. We admonish appellant's counsel for representing that the required deposit had been paid, and we remind appellant's counsel of his obligation of candor towards this court. SNP-RR/WM/MD 04-12230
07/06/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.