judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MLACNIK (GREG) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42124
Short Caption:MLACNIK (GREG) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48945
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030090Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16441
10/02/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 2, 2003. Court Reporter: E. Nelson. Filed in district court on: September 26, 2003. 03-16442
10/13/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 2, 2003. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson. 03-16924
10/15/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 03-17156
10/17/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 27, 2003. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 03-17342
11/13/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 19, 2003. 03-18893
11/20/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19391
11/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The rough draft transcripts were filed in the district court on September 26, 2003, and the requested transcripts were filed in this court on October 13, 2003. If court reporter or recorder Eric Nelson has not provided copies to counsel, he shall do so immediately. The motion for an extension of time is granted in part. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 03-19761
12/02/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 11/26/03 addressed to Eric Nelson (Court Reporter) remailed to corrected address.
12/17/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-21018
12/17/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. 03-21020
12/24/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-21440
02/18/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-03136
03/16/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-03411
03/16/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 18, 2004. 04-03411