judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPENCER (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42141
Short Caption:SPENCER (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50126
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030969Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-16661
11/18/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 06/23/03 and 06/24/03. Court Reporter: C. Voh. Filed in district court on: 11/14/03. 03-19195
11/21/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 24, 2003. 03-19433
11/25/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19734
11/25/2003MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 42140/42141. 03-19735
12/05/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to consolidate these appeals. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Counsel also filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the fast track statement and appendix. Nos. 41240/41241. (03-20227)
12/22/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-00720
12/24/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 24, 25, 2003. Court Reporter: D. Davidson. Filed in district court on: 12/19/03. Nos. 42140/42141 (03-21436).
12/31/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Un-Consolidated Appeals. Nos. 42140/42141 (03-21725).
01/08/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 24 & 25, 2003. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. Nos. 42140/42141 (04-00471). 01/16/04 ORDER: No. 42140 and 42141 are no longer consolidated. Proceedings of June 24 & 25, 2003 filed on January 8, 2004 are for No. 42141 only (District Court No. CR030969).
01/14/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 42140/42141 (04-00846).
01/16/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On November 25, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals. This court granted the motion on December 5, 2003. On December 31, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a motion requesting that this court order that these appeals are no longer consolidated. Although the underlying cases were consolidated for sentencing, separate trials were conducted. Cause appearing, the motion is granted, and these appeals will proceed separately. On December 22, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time in which to file the fast track statement in Docket No. 42141. The motion is granted. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix in Docket No. 42141. Nos. 42140/42141-cases are no longer consolidated. 04-00986
02/06/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-02405
02/06/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-02406
02/25/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-03629
04/05/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn10[Because appellant is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper person in this court. See NRAP 46(b). The clerk of this court shall return to appellant unfiled all proper person documents appellant has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-06163
04/05/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Michael Stewart Spencer. Returned unfiled, the original "Proper Person Motion to Dismiss Conflict of Interest Attorney and Request for Appointment of Conflict Free Attorney and the Supplemental Fast track Statement, received on February 20, 2004."
04/30/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07075
04/30/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/13/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 4, 2004. 04-07075