judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PUBLIC AGENCY COMP. TRUST VS. MARTIN

Case Information: 42144
Short Caption:PUBLIC AGENCY COMP. TRUST VS. MARTINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A462983Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/21/2003 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16665
10/07/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/07/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/21/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/21/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Story & Sertic, Ltd.--check no. 1917.
10/21/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17521
10/23/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Eugene Osko. (docketing statement)
11/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 22, 2003. 03-18616
11/10/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Eugene Osko. (case appeal statement)
12/01/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-19926
12/09/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-20491
01/07/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-00373
01/07/2004MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Accept Tendered Insurance Proceeds, or in the Alternative, Motion to Interplead those Insurance Proceeds, and Motion to Dismiss Respondent Virginia Hannum. 04-00375
01/15/2004MotionFiled Motion. Joinder to Motion to Accept Tendered Insurance Proceeds, or in the Alternative, Motion to Interplead those Insurance Proceeds, and Motion to Dismiss Respondent Virginia Hannum. 04-00925
01/21/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent Deborah Martin's Opposition to Appellant Pact's Motion to Accept Tendered Insurance Proceeds, or in the Alternative, Motion to Interplead those Insurance Proceeds and Motion to Dismiss Respondent Virginia Hannum. 04-01265
01/21/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
02/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from this order's date to: show cause why he should not be sanctioned for failing to provide full and accurate responses to docketing statement directives and failing to attach the required documentation; file an amended docketing statement; show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) fn5[We defer ruling on appellant's January 7, 2004 motion, pending appellant's compliance with this order and our resolution of the jurisdictional issue.] 04-02361
03/05/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 04-04173
03/05/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amended Docketing Statement. 04-04175
04/14/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. When our preliminary review of the documents submitted to this court pursuant to NRAP 3(e), as well as the docketing statement and documents attached thereto, revealed a potential jurisdictional defect, we ordered appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We also directed appellant's counsel to file a fully-completed amended docketing statement and to show cause why this court should not sanction him for this dereliction. Although we decline to sanction appellant's counsel, we remind counsel that the purpose of the docketing statement is to assist this court in identifying jurisdiction defects. We agree that the September 11, 2004 order is an appealable final judgment. fn3[Respondents have not replied to the show cause order.] Accordingly, we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the opening brief (and appendix). Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). we grant appellant's unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal as to Virginia Hannum. fn5[We deny appellant's motion to accept tendered insurance proceeds, or in the alternative, motion to interplead those insurance proceeds.] 04-06906
06/28/2004BriefReceived Opening Brief. 04-11835
06/29/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-12000
07/02/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed June 29, 2004. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on June 28, 2004. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 04-12147
07/02/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-11835
07/02/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-11836
08/02/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. Deborah Martin's Answering Brief. 04-14018
08/30/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-15660
01/06/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
04/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NRAP 34(f)(1). 05-07602
04/19/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP05-RR/MG/JH
05/12/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-09277
05/19/2005MotionFiled Motion. 05-09863
06/07/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-09430
06/07/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/15/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Publish. This court previously entered an order of affirmance. Respondent has filed a motion for publication of that decision as an opinion. The motion is unopposed. We conclude that publication is not warranted. We deny the motion. 05-11732
06/27/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2005. 05-09430