judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUFFMAN (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42143
Short Caption:HUFFMAN (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFO010305Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16663
10/07/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 25, 2003. Court Reporter: Geanne Null. Filed in district court on: October 2, 2003. 03-16664
10/08/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 25, 2003. Court Reporter: Jeanne Null. 03-16758
11/19/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 24, 2003. 03-19257
11/24/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-19604
11/24/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-19605
12/16/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-20890
04/07/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-06387
05/04/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07233
05/04/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/13/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 6, 2004. 04-07233