Case: 03-17-00635-CV
03-17-00635-CV
09/28/2017
Mandamus
In re Joseph Deeb, d/b/a JD Motors
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/28/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/15/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | Conditionally Granted |
| ||||
12/14/2017 | Submitted | | |||||
11/08/2017 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||
11/02/2017 | Objection filed |
| |||||
11/01/2017 | Response filed |
| |||||
11/01/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/01/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
10/31/2017 | Affidavit filed |
| |||||
10/18/2017 | Order entered | Ordered |
| ||||
10/18/2017 | Motion to stay disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/16/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/13/2017 | Motion to stay filed |
| |||||
10/13/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
10/05/2017 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||
09/28/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/15/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
12/15/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pike, Mickey | Real party in interest | Ms. Amy Clark |
Joseph Deeb, d/b/a JD Motors | Relator | Mr. Joel S. Pace |
Pike, Kevin | Real party in interest | Ms. Amy Clark |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Travis
Honorable Eric Shepperd
C-1-CV-16-009680