judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORENO (JUAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42126
Short Caption:MORENO (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030906Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16449
10/02/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 7, 8, 9, and 10, 2003. Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporters. Filed in district court on: September 29, 2003. 03-16450
10/08/2003Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on October 3, 2003. 03-16773
10/16/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 10, 2003. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 03-17269
10/22/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 9, 2003. Court Reporter: Constance Eisenberg. 03-17536
10/29/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 7, 2003. Court Reporter: Gail West-Willsey. 03-18079
11/05/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/8/03. Court Reporter: Wendy Pearson. 03-18409
11/13/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 19, 2003. 03-18894
11/21/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19511
12/04/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 21, 2003. Appellant's counsel shall file the fast track statement and appendix on or before December 19, 2003. 03-20143
12/22/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-21255
01/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 22, 2003. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix in this appeal. Counsel for appellant is cautioned that further extensions will not be granted. 04-00699
01/16/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/07/03. Court Reporter: Gail West-Willsey. 04-01015
02/02/2004MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. 04-02069
02/04/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 2, 2004. The clerk shall file the 17-page fast track statement and appendix received on February 2, 2004. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date o f this order to file and serve the fast track response. 04-02228
02/04/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-02071
02/04/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-02072
02/27/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: March 2, 2004. 04-03724
03/03/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-04010
06/25/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-11650
07/21/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-11910
07/21/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 23, 2004. 04-11910