judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 42123

Case Information: 42125
Short Caption:CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 42123Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 42123 *, 42125Related Case(s): 46011 , 46682 , 47886 , 50487 , 53474 , 54335 , 57745
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030873Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16445
10/02/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 29, 2003 and August 28, 2003. Court Reporter: D. Vieira. Filed in district court on: September 29, 2003. 03-16446
10/08/2003MotionFiled Stipulation. (to consolidate case nos. 42123 and 42125). 03-16771
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. Order Approving Stipulation. On October 8, 2003, the parties filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. Cause appearing, the stipulation is approved, and these appeals are hereby consolidated for all appellate purposes. Nos. 42123/42125 [03-17535]
11/06/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 42123/42125 (03-18531).
11/06/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. Nos. 42123/42125 (03-18532).
11/26/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 42123/42125. (03-19769)
02/25/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM. Nos. 42123/42125. 04-03630
03/23/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-03653
03/23/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 24, 2004. 04-03653