judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. DEP'T OF PAROLE & PROBATION

Case Information: 42113
Short Caption:SMITH VS. DEP'T OF PAROLE & PROBATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A464195Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16304
10/07/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 09/30/03 addressed to Jewell Smith returned "Not at SDCC-RTS-Paroled". No forwarding address.
10/29/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction." SNP04-RR/ML/WM 03-18073
11/25/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18200
11/25/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2003. 03-18200