judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAILEY (DANNY) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 42114
Short Caption:BAILEY (DANNY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0300336HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/01/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16338
10/28/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-17977
11/25/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18138
11/25/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 26, 2003. 03-18138