judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BREZINA VS. RICHLAND HOLDINGS

Case Information: 42129
Short Caption:BREZINA VS. RICHLAND HOLDINGSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A444190Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/21/2003 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/03/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16477
10/03/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/03/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/20/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 03-17483
10/21/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/18/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to pay Filing Fee, to file Case Appeal Statement and Docketing Statement, and Denying Motion to Dismiss. On September 30, 2003, appellant filed the notice of appeal in the district court. On October 3, 2003, this court issued notices directing appellant to pay the filing fee and to file a case appeal statement. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notices. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, pay the filing fee and file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement. When this appeal was docketed in this court, a settlement notice was issued informing appellant that the docketing statement must be filed within 15 days of the docketing of the appeal. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. We caution appellant that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. Respondent has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal contending that the notice of appeal filed is deficient. We deny respondents' motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. 03-19225
12/01/2003Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 03-19954
12/16/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 03-20886
12/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Pay Filing Fee. On December 1, 2003, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. An appeal shall not be dismissed, however, until the parties first "pay whatever fees are due." NRAP 42(b). Appellant shall submit the $250.00 filing fee to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order. We defer ruling on the stipulation to dismiss this appeal, pending payment of the filing fee. 03-21191
10/07/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appel and Referring Matter to State Bar of Nevada. On September 30, 2003, appellant filed the notice of appeal in the district court. The notice of appeal was not accompanied by the $250 Supreme Court filing fee. See NRAP 3(f). On October 3, 2003, this court issued a notice directing appellant to pay the fee. Appellant did not comply with this court's notice. On November 18, 2003, this court issued an order that again directed appellant to pay the filing fee within 10 days. On December 1, 2003, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. On December 22, 2003, we entered an order noting that this court generally will not dismiss an appeal pursuant to the parties' agreement unless the parties first 'pay whatever fees are due.' We deferred ruling on the stipulation to dismiss appeal, and we directed appellant, for the third time, to submit the $250 filing fee to the clerk of this court within 10 days. Nine months have passed since our last order and appellant has still not paid the filing fee. In the interest of judicial efficiency we approve the parties' December 1, 2003, stipulation and '. . . we dismiss this appeal.' Appellant having failed to comply with this court's notice issued on October 3, 2003, or this court's orders entered November 18, 2003, and December 22, 2003, directing appellant to pay the filing fee, we refer this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 105. Bar counsel shall, within 90 days from the date of this order, inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings in this matter. SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-18606
10/07/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
10/14/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hilton English and Associates--check no. 1992.
01/10/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorney Cory J. Hilton. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorney Hilton's bar file. No copy was placed in the correspondence file for this case.