judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Herring Bancorp, Inc.; C.C. Burgess; and C. Campbell Burgess v. John Mikkelsen, acting solely in his capacity as Trustee of the John Mikkelsen Trust

Case: 07-15-00327-CV
07-15-00327-CV
09/04/2015
Securities and Stocks
Herring Bancorp, Inc.; C.C. Burgess; and C. Campbell Burgess
John Mikkelsen, acting solely in his capacity as Trustee of the John Mikkelsen Trust
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
01/21/2016Reply brief filedCross-Appellant
01/21/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
12/21/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedCross-Appellee
12/21/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
11/20/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedCross-Appellant
11/20/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/13/2018Mandate issued
03/08/2018Order entered
01/26/2018Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
11/21/2017Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
11/09/2017Sent to publisher
10/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion Granted
09/08/2017Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
09/08/2017Opinion withdrawn
09/08/2017Motion for rehearing disposedMotion Granted
09/08/2017RehearingGRANT
08/22/2017Motion for leave disposedMotion Granted
08/18/2017Reply to response or motion filed
08/18/2017Motion for leave filed
08/14/2017Response filed
08/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion Granted
07/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file response filed
07/27/2017Response requested by the court
07/19/2017Motion for rehearing filed
06/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion Granted
06/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed
06/02/2017Memorandum opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
03/02/2016Document filed
03/01/2016Submitted
02/29/2016Document filed
02/19/2016Letter issued by the court
02/05/2016Set for submission on oral argument
01/21/2016Reply brief filed
01/21/2016Reply brief filed
01/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion Granted
12/30/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
12/21/2015Case ready to be set
12/21/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested
12/21/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested
12/16/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
11/20/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested
11/20/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested
11/04/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
10/14/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
10/14/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
10/12/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/12/2015Record checked out
10/09/2015Letter filed
09/30/2015Clerks record filed
09/30/2015Reporters record filed
09/21/2015Docketing statement filed
09/21/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
09/04/2015Docketing statement filed
09/04/2015Fee paid
09/04/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
07/16/2015Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
06/16/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/13/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Herring Bancorp, Inc.AppellantStephen S. Gilstrap
Manuel Berrelez
Cornell D. Curtis
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Burgess, C. CampbellAppellantThomas S. Leatherbury
Cornell D. Curtis
Stephen S. Gilstrap
Manuel Berrelez
Burgess, C.C.AppellantCornell D. Curtis
Stephen S. Gilstrap
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Manuel Berrelez
Mikkelsen, JohnAppelleeLee F. Christie
Robert L. Florance IV
Michael L. Atchley
Trial Court Information
46th District Court
Wilbarger
Honorable Dan Mike Bird
24.955
Gloria Judd Bourland