judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. HUBAY

Case Information: 42118
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. HUBAYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A470811Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/17/2003How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16408
10/02/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/06/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A470811: 30 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16548
10/06/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion for Stay. 03-16645
10/08/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny appellant's October 7, 2003 stay motion. 03-16737
10/14/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Eliza Toussant-check no. 1063.
10/17/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 03-17301
10/17/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/03/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn5[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant, and deny as moot the requested relief. In dismissing this appeal, we have not considered whether the district court erred in concluding that appellant owed respondents rent in the amount of $2,000 per month. Whether the $650 to $2,000 rental increase was valid is an issue that remains pending below.] NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-18290
12/02/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18602
12/02/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2003. 03-18602
12/23/2003Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, unfiled, documents entitled, "Lis Pendens," "Emergency Ex-Parte Motion for Permission to file in Proper Person," Emergency Ex-Parte Motion for Permission to file a Late Emergency Ex-Parte Motion for Re-Consideration of Denial and Dismissal of Docket No. :42118," and "Emergency Ex-Parte Motion for Re-Consideration of Denial and Dismissal of Docket No. :42118 and Application for Injunctive Relief and Quiet Title and Declaration of Parties Rights."