judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JORY VS. JORY

Case Information: 42119
Short Caption:JORY VS. JORYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38585
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A418732Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/20/2003 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/11/2005 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/11/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael H. Schwarz, Esq.--check no. 1062.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16415
10/02/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/20/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/27/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 22, 2003. 03-17923
10/29/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Persi J. Mishel. (case appeal statement)
11/24/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-19583
11/25/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to comply timely may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 03-19715
12/04/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-20156
12/09/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-20479
12/22/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-21292
03/02/2004MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Original Documents and Exhibits pursuant to NRAP 30(d). 04-03913
04/01/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-06092
04/01/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-06093
04/01/2004Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/30/04. 04-06099
05/04/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-08174
05/04/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 04-08175
05/18/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-09214
07/19/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 1, 2004, this court received and filed a district court order entered on March 30, 2004. The March 30, 2004, order granted appellant's motion to modify or correct the record and held that the record in District Court Case No. A418732 be expanded to include four documents filed in District Court Case No. A370238. Attached to the district court order are the four documents filed in Case No. A370238. Accordingly, this court will consider the March 30, 2004, district court order and the four documents attached to it in resolving this appeal. Respondent has moved for the transmission of original documents and exhibits pursuant to NRAP 30(d). No good cause appearing, we deny respondent's motion. 04-13063
11/17/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 11, 2005, at 11:00 a.m. (SNP05-RR/MG/JH)
12/23/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/11/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP05-RR/MG/JH
01/24/2005MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Stay Decision, or in the Alternative, Motoin to Consolidate. Nos. 42119 and 43494 (not consolidated). 05-01450
02/14/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED and REMAND this case for further proceedings consistent with this order." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-02870
02/23/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Publication as Opinion. 05-03584
03/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Stay, or in the Alternative Motion to Consolidate. On February 14, 2005, this court entered an order of reversal and remand in this appeal. We therefore deny as moot respondent's motion for a stay, or in the alternative to consolidate this appeal with Docket No. 43494. 05-03975
03/04/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 74221.
03/04/2005Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Petition for Rehearing, or in the Alternative, Joinder in Motion for Publication 05-04278
04/21/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Denying Motions for Rehearing and Publication. "Carol Jory's petition for rehearing is denied." The joint petition for publication is similarly denied. NRAP 40(c). SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-07718
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07796
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 19, 2005. 05-07796