judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREENE (DELBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42110
Short Caption:GREENE (DELBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41713 , 43628 , 44019 , 45127 , 46616 , 52584 , 56013 , 56546 , 61674 , 67481
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C184914Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-16298
11/12/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 17, 2003. 03-18812
11/19/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19298
12/01/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Counsel requests an extra 45 days to file the fast track statement. The motion is denied. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days of the date of this order, file a rough draft transcript request in compliance with NRP 3C(d)(3) in the district court and file copies of the request in this court and shall have 30 days to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 03-19863
01/12/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/22/03; 05/23/03; and 09/09/03. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 04-00675
01/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, counsel has failed to file any of the required documents or otherwise communicate with this court. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days of this order file in this court copies of the rough draft transcript request form as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3) and shall have 10 days to file the fast track statement and appendix, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned. 04-01250
02/02/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-02075
02/02/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-02076
02/04/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 27, 2003. Court Reporter: Julie M. Lever. 04-02225
03/05/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Robert L. Langford as counsel for appellant. 04-04242
03/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track response has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 04-04480
03/23/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-05427
03/23/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 04-05428
05/18/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn7[Because Greene is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant him permission to file documents in proper person in this court. See NRAP 46(b). Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return to Greene unfiled all proper person documents he has submitted to this court in this matter.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-09212
05/18/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Delbert M. Greene. Returned unfiled, the original "Proper Person Application of Notice of Writ of Certiorari received on October 24, 2003; Writ of Certiorari received on October 29, 2003; Motion to Dismiss Counsel of Record; Appoint Appellant Counsel for Appeal received on November 19, 2003; Motion to Dismiss Counsel of Record and Appoint Appellant Counsel received on April 20, 2004; Motion for Leave to Proceed with Supplement Brief Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 46(b) received on April 26, 2004; and Appellant's Supporting/Opening Brief of Writ of Certioari received on April 26, 2004.
06/15/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-09334
06/15/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 17, 2004. 04-09334