judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUMPHREY VS. MILLER

Case Information: 42130
Short Caption:HUMPHREY VS. MILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A453005Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/23/2003 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Law Offices of Grenville Pridham--check no. 6168. (Additional $150 due.)
10/03/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16482
10/03/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Additional $150 due. Due Date: 10 days
10/23/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/20/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Michael D. Humphrey's Motion for an Entry of an Order, Nunc Pro Tunc, Extending Time to File Docketing Statement. 03-19361
11/21/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Directing Payment of the Filing Fee. To date, appellant has failed to pay the additional filing fee. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, pay to this court the additional $150.00 of the filing fee. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on November 20, 2003. 03-19434
11/21/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-19362
11/24/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Craig A. Hoppe. (docketing statement)
12/08/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150.00 from Grenville Pridham - check no. 3015.
04/08/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 04-06515
04/19/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 04-07108
04/26/2004Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 04-07625
05/07/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 04-08489
05/07/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.