judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. SCHWARZ

Case Information: 46044
Short Caption:SMITH VS. SCHWARZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D251592
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D176396
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/09/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/03/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-19592
10/24/2005Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: 7/19/05. 8/24/05, 9/7/05 and 11/7/05. Court Reporter: not listed. 05-21035
11/18/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Admit Documents and Taped Evidence for Supreme Court Review. 05-22809
11/18/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-22813
11/18/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Stay. 05-22814
11/28/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. D251592: 60 days. 05-23204
12/06/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice from respondent James Schwarz re: appellant Stacie Smith. 05-23773
01/09/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 06-00577
01/09/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Since we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, " . . . we dismiss it." fn5[We deny appellant's November 18, 2005 motion to admit documents and taped evidence to this court, and direct the clerk to return, unfiled, the proper person documents and taped evidence provisionally received in this court on November 18, 2005. We deny as moot appellant's October 24, 2005 transcript request and her November 18, 2005 motion for a stay.] NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-03718
02/21/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Two sets of documents (filed in the Family Court, Hawaii) and taped Evidence for Supreme Court Review received on November 18, 2005, to appellant Stacie M. Smith.
03/21/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04383
03/21/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 23, 2006. 06-04383