judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION (CLE)

Case Information: 46043
Short Caption:IN RE: CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION (CLE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56143 , 58961
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Other - Petition
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
10/03/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/03/2005Petition/BarFiled Petition. 05-19537
10/24/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Kurt D. Anderson, Kenneth A. Caschette, Maria U. Estanislao, David L. Evans, Frank J. Fahrenkopf, Michael J. Harker, Stephen N. Scheerer, Mark A. Sikora, Ulrich W. Smith, Afshin Tadayon and Cameron P. Vandenberg) 05-21071
12/02/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Narbeh Bagddsarian, Katherine Barrett, Martin Burns, Jeffrey Conway, Jack Coronel, Jorge Corral, Rachel Crus, Robert Langford, Mark Mausert, William McGimsey, Patrick McKnight, Berna Rhodes-Ford) 05-23641
01/10/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The Board has filed documents entitled "Consent to Dismissal" informing this court that certain respondent attorneys have satisfied the requirements set forth in SCR 205 through 215. Cause appearing, we grant the Board's request and dismiss the petition with prejudice as to those respondent attorneys. Based upon our review of the petition, it appears that certain attorneys have failed to comply fully with the requirements set forth in SCR 205 through 215. These bar members shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition to change their status from active to inactive and, from the date of such change of status, be prohibited from practicing law in the State of Nevada until reinstated. (See order for list of attorneys.) 06-00677
01/30/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (B. Mahlon Brown, Thomas Byron, Thomas Dillard, Jr., Harry Gilbert, James W. King, Steven C. Lynes, Mark Peplowski). 06-02193
02/08/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (William S. Roberts, Anne J. Williams) 06-02808
02/13/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response of Michele Eber to Order to Show Cause. 06-03104
02/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (James O. Porter). 06-03129
02/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Kathleen E. Delaney). 06-03130
02/16/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Waldo DeCastroverde, Christopher Dias). 06-03492
02/17/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Paul A. Sherman). 06-03691
02/17/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Fred W. Kennedy, Randall R. Leonard, Charles A. Michalek, Peter N. Reynolds). 06-03692
02/23/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Lew W. Carnahan). 06-04011
03/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Jeffrey Larson, Stacy Roundtree, Charlane Stead). 06-04842
03/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Kerry K. Ison). 06-05392
03/31/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Jerome P. Doctors). 06-06859
04/04/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from CLE Board requesting that attorney J. Thomas Hale's name be removed from the petition as he is deceased. (Treated as errata to petition). 06-07022
04/25/2006Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Granting Bar Petition. On January 10, 2006, this court entered an order directing the following active attorneys to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition to change their status from active to inactive and to condition their right to be reinstated upon full compliance with SCR 213: Patti-Ann Audia, Bert Mahlon Brown, III, Charles F. Burrows, Lew W. Carnahan, Waldo DeCastroverde, Kathleen E. Delaney, Christopher A. Dias, Thomas D. Dillard, Jr., Jerome P. Doctors, Jeffrey E. Fisher, Stacey M. Garrett, Ronald A. Geller, Thomas Grady, Karen T. Grant-Head, Gary R. Huntsman, Kerry K. Ison, Fred W. Kennedy, Jinna Kim, James W. King, Jeffrey R. Larson, Janelle C. LaVigne, Won S. Lee, Randall R. Leonard, Steven C. Lynes, Thomas C. Michaelides, Charles A. Michalek, David J. Pancoast, John David L. Pearce, Mark E. Peplowski, Clark A. Peterson, Peter N. Reynolds, William S. Roberts, Leonard J. Root, Stacey Roundtree, Thomas S. Shaddix, Paul A. Sherman, Charlane B. Stead, Joseph X. Tangredi, John W. Thomson, Taovaonga L. Vuki Lui and Anne J. Williams. That order also directed the following inactive, suspended, disabled or disbarred attorneys to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition and condition their right to be reinstated to active status upon full compliance with SCR 213 in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Andras F. Babero, John J. Brannelly, Jr., Deborah E. Broom, John R. Browning, Thomas W. Byron, Kristin C. Castle, Lisa Coatney, Lawrence J. Davidson, Michele Eber fn1[On February 13, 2006, Ms. Eber filed a response to our Order to Show Cause. Ms. Eber requests this court and the Board to 'allow [her] the opportunity to change [her] current status with the Bar from 'disabled, suspended or disbarred' to 'inactive.'' This court will not change Ms. Eber's status based merely on her request.], Kendall C. Farr, Harry C. Gilbert, Timothy T. Heaton, Jay T. Hopkins, Quan V. Luc, Lori M. Mazur, Terry M. McCoy, James I. Mitchell, Liane S. Perlmutter, George R. Pike, James O. Porter, Andrew J. Rankin, Michael D. Ross, Steven L. Sorenson and Thomas J. Vivone. On January 30, 2006, February 8, 2006, February 13, 2006, February 16, 2006, February 17, 2006, February 23, 2006, March 6, 2006, March 13, 2006, and March 31, 2006, the Board filed documents entitled 'Consent to Dismissal,' informing this court that the following attorneys have satisfied the requirements set forth in SCR 205 through 215: Bert Mahlon Brown, III, Thomas W. Byron, Lew W. Carnahan, Waldo DeCastroverde, Kathleen E. Delaney, Christopher A. Dias, Thomas D. Dillard, Jr., Jerome P. Doctors, Harry C. Gilbert, Kerry K. Ison, Fred W. Kennedy, James W. King, Jeffrey R. Larson, Randall R. Leonard, Steven C. Lynes, Charles A. Michalek, Mark E. Peplowski, James O. Porter, Peter N. Reynolds, William S. Roberts, Stacey Roundtree, Paul A. Sherman, Charlane B. Stead and Anne J. Williams. We conclude that these respondent attorneys have completed the requirements for reinstatement under SCR 213, and we dismiss the Board's petition with prejudice as to each of them. The remaining active attorneys have failed to respond to our show cause order entered January 10, 2006. We grant the Board's petition as to these attorneys. The status of the following active respondent attorneys shall be changed to inactive, and their rights of reinstatement shall be conditioned upon full compliance with SCR 213: Patti-Ann Audia; Charles F. Burrows; Jeffrey E. Fisher; Stacey M. Garrett; Ronald A. Geller; Thomas Grady; Karen T. Grant-Head; Gary R. Huntsman; Jinna Kim; Janelle C. LaVigne; Won S. Lee; Thomas C. Michaelides; David J. Pancoast; John David L. Pearce; Clark A. Peterson; Leonard J. Root; Thomas S. Shaddix; Joseph X. Tangredi; John W. Thomson; and Taovaonga L. Vuki Lui. We grant the Board's petition as to the following inactive, suspended, disabled or disbarred attorneys. Their ri 06-08647
04/25/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
05/03/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Gary R. Huntsman). (Filed via fax.) (No action required.) 06-09305
05/05/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Gary R. Huntsman) - filed via fax on 5/3/06. (No action required.) 06-09305
05/05/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Leonard J. Root). (No action required.) 06-09460
05/19/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Janelle Lavigne) (No action required.) 06-10657
06/19/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Jeffrey E. Fisher). (No action required.) 06-12810
07/10/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Karen T. Grant-Head and Thomas C. Michaelides). (No action required.) 06-14210
08/03/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Joseph X. Tangredi) (No action required.) 06-16122
09/12/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Michele Eber) (No action required.) 06-18808
09/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Thomas S. Shaddix) (No action required.) 06-18874
09/15/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Deborah E. Broom) (No action required.) 06-19053
10/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (George Russell Pike). (No action required.) 06-20506
12/12/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Steven L. Sorenson) (No action required.) 06-25388
02/01/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Quan V. Luc) (No action required.) 07-02655
03/05/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Ronald A. Geller). (No action required.) 07-05189
03/22/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (John David L. Pearce). (No action required.) 07-06525
11/08/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Stacey M. Garrett). (No action required.) 07-24412
01/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Liane S. Perlmutter Binowitz). (No action required.) 08-01771
01/24/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Taovaonga L. Vuki-Lui). (No action required.) 08-01916
04/11/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (John J. Brannelly, Jr.) (No action required.) 08-09062
09/03/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (John W. Thomson) (No action required.) 09-21415
05/16/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Jinna Kim) (No action required.) 11-14434
08/24/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Andras Babero) (No action required.) 12-26861
10/04/2012Notice/IncomingFiled ice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Jay Hopkins) (No action required.) 12-31362