judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRIS (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46039
Short Caption:HARRIS (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45438 , 46151
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C194673Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-19473
11/07/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We have received all proper person documents and conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-21881
12/02/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-22439
12/02/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/08/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2005. 05-22439