judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF PATRICK B. WALSH

Case Information: 42107
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF PATRICK B. WALSHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/26/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 through 3. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16173
09/26/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline.
09/09/2004Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. We approve the panel's recommendation. "Walsh shall be suspended from the practice of law for six months and one day." fn2[Under SCR 115, the suspension is effective fifteen days from the date of this order. We note that since the suspension is for more than six months, Walsh may not practice law until he is reinstated by this court. See SCR 116(1).] Additionally, Walsh shall pay the costs of the disciplinary proceeding. fn3[Walsh and the State Bar shall comply with SCR 115.] fn4[This is our final disposition of this matter. Any new proceedings concerning Walsh shall be docketed under a new docket number.] EN BANC 04-16506
10/05/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 3 this day. 04-16674
10/05/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/21/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2004. 04-16674