judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION (CLE)

Case Information: 42106
Short Caption:IN RE: CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION (CLE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56143 , 58961
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Other - Petition
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
09/26/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/26/2003Petition/BarFiled Petition. 03-16127
11/03/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Edward B. Hughes) 03-18275
11/03/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Valner L. Johnson) 03-18279
11/03/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Robert L. Langford, John W. Myers, IV, and Michelle O. Tobler) 03-18283
11/03/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Brent D. Percival and Michael H. Schwarz) 03-18284
11/10/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (John J. Brannelly, Jr., John P. Calvert and Peter A. Tomiano) 03-18742
11/12/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Lew W. Carnahan, Marcus D. Cooper, Jonathan A. Henricks, William L. McGimsey, and Wendy E. Miller). 03-18863
11/25/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Theodore C. Herrera and Janet Olguin) 03-19716
01/16/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (George W. Johnson, John R. Lusk, Scott N. Tisevich) 04-01043
01/16/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Stacey M. Garrett, Michael C. Radmilovich) 04-01046
01/16/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Koel M. Korotkin, R. Christina Ross) 04-01048
01/28/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the Board's request and dismiss the petition with prejudice as to respondent attorneys Edward B. Hughes; Valner L. Johnson; Robert L. Langford; John W. Myers, IV; Michelle O. Tobler; Brent D. Percival; Michael H. Schwarz; John J. Brannelly, Jr.; John P. Calvert; Peter A. Tomaino; Lew W. Carnahan; Marcus D. Cooper; Jonathan A. Hendricks; William L. McGimsey; Wendy E. Miller; Theodore C. Herrera; Janet Olguin; George W. Johnson; John R. Lusk; Scott N. Tisevich; Stacey M. Garrett; Michael C. Radmilovich; Joel M. Korotkin; and R. Christina Ross. Based upon our review of the petition, it appears that the following attorneys have failed to comply fully with the requirements set forth in SCR 205 through 215: Rosemarie E. Arnold, Andras F. Babero, Marvin B. Beddoe, Patrick G. Christoff, Waldo DeCastroverde, Michael Devereaux, Rhial N. Devine, Kendall C. Farr, Jack A. Ferguson, Gerard A. Fierro, Jeffrey E. Fisher, George E. Franzen, Karen T. Grant-Head, Shawn F. Hackman, Nicholas E. Hales, Keith W. Hart, Trevor L. Hart, Laurence A. Hecker, G. Brent Heggie, John E. Hummel, Matthew B. Kane, Francis Kocka, Gordon Lewis, Roger C. Molett, Jeffrey D. Morrison, Jerome Osburn, Susana Reyes, Timothy Sears, Gary M. Segal, Paul A. Sherman, Carl E. Sizemore, Gregory S. Skinner, Arthur H. Skola, Samuel F. Stapleton, Jeffrey N. Starkey, Patrick B. Walsh, Cecil A. Wariner, Anne J. Williams, Mitchell C. Wright, and Peter A. Zwichorowski. Accordingly, the following active members of the State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition to change their status from active to inactive and, from the date of such change of status, be prohibited from practicing law in the State of Nevada until reinstated as allowed under SCR 213: Rosemarie E. Arnold, Andras F. Babero, Waldo DeCastroverde, Kendall C. Farr, Gerard A. Fierro, Jeffrey E. Fisher, Karen T. Grant-Head, Nicholas E. Hales, Trevor L. Hart, Laurence A. Hecker, John E. Hummel, Francis Kocka, Timothy Sears, Gary M. Segal, Paul A. Sherman, Carl E. Sizemore, Gregory S. Skinner, Arthur H. Skola, Samuel F. Stapleton, Cecil A. Wariner, and Anne J. Williams. Further, the following inactive members of the State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition to condition their rights to be reinstated to active status upon full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Marvin B. Beddoe, Michael Devereaux, Jack A. Ferguson, Gordon Lewis, and Peter A. Zwichorowski. Finally, the following disbarred, disabled or suspended members of the State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition to condition their rights to be reinstated to active status upon full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Patrick G. Christoff, Rhial N. Devine, George E. Franzen, Shawn F. Hackman, Keith W. Hart, G. Brent Heggie, Matthew B. Kane, Roger C. Molett, Jeffrey D. Morrison, Jerome Osburn, Susana Reyes, Jeffrey N. Starkey, Patrick B. Walsh, and Mitchell C. Wright. fn1[The Honorable robert E. Rose, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 04-01639
02/24/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Francis Kocka) 04-03574
03/02/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Waldo DeCastroverde, Carl E. Sizemore, Gregory S. Skinner.) 04-03923
03/26/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Gerard A. Fierro; Timothy Sears; Paul A. Sherman; and Peter A. Zwichorowski). 04-05703
03/30/2004Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Granting Bar Petition. On January 28, 2004, this court entered an order dismissing the petition with prejudice as to respondent attorneys Edward B. Hughes; Valner L. Johnson; Robert L. Langford; John W. Myers, IV; Michelle O. Tobler; Brent D. Percival; Michael H. Schwarz; John J. Brannelly, Jr.; John P. Calvert; Peter A. Tomaino; Lew W. Carnahan; Marcus D. Cooper; Jonathan A. Hendricks; William L. McGimsey; Wendy E. Miller; Theodore C. Herrera; Janet Olguin; George W. Johnson; John R. Lusk; Scott N. Tisevich; Stacey M. Garrett; Michael C. Radmilovich; Joel M. Korotkin; and R. Christina Ross. The Board has since filed additional "Consent to Dismissal"documents. We grant the Board's request and dismiss the petition with prejudice as to respondent attorneys Francis Kocka; Waldo De Castroverde; Carl E. Sizemore; Gregory S. Skinner; Gerard A. Fierro; Timothy Sears; Paul A. Sherman; and Peter A. Zwichorowski. The remaining respondent attorneys have failed to respond to our January 28, 2004, order. Accordingly, we grant the Board's petition as to these attorneys. The status of the following respondent attorneys shall be changed from active to inactive. The following respondent attorneys are prohibited from practicing law in the State of Nevada until reinstated as allowed under SCR 213: Rosemarie E. Arnold; Andras F. Babero; Kendall C. Farr; Jeffrey E. Fisher; Karen T. Grant-Head; Nicholas E. Hales; Trevor L. Hart; Laurence A. Hecker; John E. Hummel; Gary M. Segal; Arthur H. Skola; Samuel F. Stapleton; Cecil A. Wariner; and Anne J. Williams. These attorneys shall have 15 days from the date of this order to notify, by registered or certified mail, return receipt requested, all clients being represented in pending matters, and the attorney or attorneys for each adverse party in such matters, of their change in status and consequent inability to act as an attorney as of the date of this order. Within 25 days from the date of this order, these attorneys shall file with this court an affidavit showing either that they have served all clients, if any, with notification of their change in status or that they have been reinstated to active status pursuant to SCR 213. The following inactive members of the State Bar shall remain inactive. Their right to be reinstated to active status shall be conditioned on full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Marvin B. Beddoe; Michael Devereaux; Jack A. Ferguson; and Gordon Lewis. Finally, the following disbarred, disabled or suspended members of the State Bar shall maintain their disbarred, disabled or suspended status. Their right to be reinstated to active status shall be conditioned on full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Patrick G. Christoff; Rhial N. Devine; George E. Franzen; Shawn F. Hackman; Keith W. Hart; G. Brent Heggie; Matthew B. Kane; Roger C. Molett; Jeffrey D. Morrison; Jerome Osburn; Susana Reyes; Jeffrey N. Starkey; Patrick B. Walsh; and Mitchell C. Wright. fn1[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 04-05884
03/30/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
03/31/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Rosemarie E. Arnold and Gary M. Segal) 04-05978
04/09/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Anne J. Williams) (No action required.) 04-06651
04/14/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (S. Frank Stapleton) (No action required.) 04-06845
04/23/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Jeffrey E. Fisher) (No action required.) 04-07545
04/23/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Cecil A. Wariner) (No action required.) 04-07546
05/06/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Nicholas E. Hales) (No action required). 04-08423
05/11/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Kendall C. Farr) (No action required.) 04-08695
05/27/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatment (Karen Grant-Head). (No action required.) 04-09840
06/01/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatment (Mitchell C. Wright). (No action required.) 04-09995
06/29/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. the March 30, 2004, order changed the Bar status of attorneys Andras F. Babero, Trevor L. Hart, Laurence A. Hecker, John E. Hummel, and Arthur H. Skola from active to inactive. That order also directed these attorneys to notify, by registered or certified mail, return receipt requested, all clients being represented in pending matters, and the attorney or attorneys for each adverse party in such matters, of their change in status and consequent inability to act as an attorney as of March 30, 2004. Finally, those attorneys were directed to file with this court, within 25 days, affidavits showing either that they have served all clients, if any, with notification of their change in status or that they have been reinstated to active status pursuant to SCR 213. To date, the above-named attorneys have failed to file the necessary affidavits with this court. Accordingly, they shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the necessary affidavits with this court or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 04-11884
10/28/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Andras F. Babero). (No action required). 04-19919
03/10/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (John E. Hummel). (No action required). 05-04794
10/17/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Arthur H. Skola). (No action required). 05-20521
06/29/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Jeffrey N. Starkey). (No action required). 06-13456
03/09/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Rhial N. Devine). (No action required.) 07-05698
03/06/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Matthew B. Kane). (No action required.) 08-05653
07/16/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinistatement. (Jack A. Ferguson) . (No action required.) 08-18225
05/20/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinistatement. (Gordon Lewis) . (No action required.) 09-12509
08/20/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinistatement. (Trevor Hart) . (No action required.) 13-24555
03/06/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Susana Reyes (no action required). 14-07235
11/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement. (Marvin Bart Beddoe) . (No action required.) 17-40035